Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cardinal Entities Company, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Kinney, Philip Scott, against St Johns Seafood & Steaks, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with JACK M. SCHEMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PROPOSED DISMISSAL FOR RECORD INACTIVITY AND NOTICE OF HEARING 6/25/15 AT 4:00P RM 737 | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MARK AXLER | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING JAN 15, 2014 9:30AM HON JACK M. SCHEMER | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT PLTF'S, ON DEFAULT | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ST. JOHNS SEAFOOD & STEAKS,INC. | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) ST. JOHNS SEAFOOD & STEAKS, INC. | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ST. JOHNS SEAFOOD & STEAKS, INC. 1/4/13 | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED 1 | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1730862 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.