Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hyde, Ryan Thomas, Scudder, Randy, against Donna Easternling, Jack Easterling, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-B |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS $0.00 AMT | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO BAYMIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC OR BK 17027 PG 1875 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING (AMENDED) CLERK TO ISSUE THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2231475 | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DIRECT THE CLERK TO ISSUE THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PLAINTIFF | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT. $78,300.00 BOOK 16809 PAGE 331-332 | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER DISBURSE $3,967.98 TO: ALBERTELLI LAW TRUST ACCOUNT P.O. BOX 23028 TAMPA, FL 33623 (BAL $0.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.