Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citimortgage, Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pierrilus, Kathleen, against Highland Lakes Owers Associaton,Inc.;, Jorge T Nocom, Joy P Cipriano, Mazda American Credit,Inc.;, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING-OTHER | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 16131 PAGE 1852-1853 | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFS/DEFT HIGHLAND LAKES OWNERS ASSOC INC/ATTY | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT, RECEIVED 1/3/12 SERVED 1/31/12 | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JORGE T. NOCOM 1/17/12 | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JOY P. CIPRIANO 1/17/12 | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2 | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #1 | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE HIGHLAND LAKES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC., 01062012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.