Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fernando Martongelli, filed a(n) case represented by Vane, Terence G Jr, against International General Development, Inc, represented by Brown, Charles Wayne Jr, Jubran, Asad Sam, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with GARY L. WILKINSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1465639
Date: December 30, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S FIRST) | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -A SAM JUBRAN ESQUIRE FORM 12/20/21 THROUGH 1/4/22 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Plan | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION PLTF'S VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE DEFT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- DENIED AND GRANTING PLTF'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO MAKE DEFT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES MORE SPECIFIC - GRANTED | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY FROM JULY 7 2021 - JULY 16 2021 | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUNE 24TH 2021 @ 11;00 AM B/F THE HON GARY L. WILKINSON VIA ZOOM. | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -COUNSEL FOR DEFT ON 12/23/2020- 01/05/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.