Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) case represented by Naderpour, Amir, against Karen P Mann, Steven H Mann, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with WALLACE, III, WADDELL A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1465646
Date: December 30, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT/WHITEHOUSE ANIMAL HOSPITAL INC | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ; KAREN P. MANN FILED CHAPTER 7 (15-4734) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE /ATTY PLAINTIFF | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED CONTINUING | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO GARNISHEE-WHITEHOUSE ANIMAL HOSPITAL, INC. | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $85.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2428926 | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (CONTINUING) | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.