Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bales, Douglas Michael, Mcdonald, Tara Marie, Reider, David Louis, Zahm, Douglas Clark, against Citifinancial Equity Services Inc, Jeffrey S Ward, Unknown Spouse Of Jeffrey S Ward, Unknown Tenants In Possession Of The Property, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 Division: Fc-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $2.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2547040 | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 1465385 HAD A REFUND OF $70.00 AMOUNT SENT TO MARINOSCI LAW GROUP, P.C. | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $521.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1465385 | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 1465385 REVISED | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS DISBURSE $2.50 TO: RONNIE FUSSELL AND $50,297.50 TO:WELLS FARGO BANKC/O EXL LEGAL, PLLC12425 28TH STREET NORTH, STE. 200ST. PETERSBURG, FL 33716 | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO : EF WILSON ENTERPRISES, LLC OR BK17368 PG2160 | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER A DEPOSIT OF $2,515.00 WAS AUTOMATICALLY TAKEN FROM REAL AUCTION BIDDER 26282'S ACCOUNT. THIRD PARTY PURCHASER COMPLETED PAYMENT BY USING THE FUNDS IN HIS ACCOUNT. FUNDS ARE BROKEN UP AS FOLLOWS: REMAINING BALANCE OF AUCTION PD: $ | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $48,617.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2524829 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO : EF WILSON ENTERPRISES, LLC ,BIDDER # 26282, BID $ 50,300.00 BOOK 17358 PAGE 201-202 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.