Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gryglewicz, Nathan Paul, against Howard Walker Homeowners Association,Inc.;, Micolle D Rosenberry, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2011 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-B |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS -$0.00 AMT | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO WELLS FARGO BANK, NA OR BK PG 16986 PAGE 998 | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT. $58,400.00 BOOK 16968 PAGE 1285-1286 | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION -NOTICE OF SALE, PLACED ON SALES SHELF | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FILED IN BOX 37 (NOTE) | |
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 11/05/2014 11AM | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS FILED - NOTE (FILED BEFORE JUDGE 10/2/14) | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF ORIGINAL NOTE | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM : DISPOSED BY NON-JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.