Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) case represented by De Leon, Michelle Annette, against Chad D Robertson, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MCCALLA RAYMER FOR PLAINTIFF | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC BK 15544 PG 1484 | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT.$100.00 BOOK 15532 PAGE 197-198 | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1234277 | |
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 03/03/2011 1100AM | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.