Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) case represented by Mills, Christopher Young, Rasmussen, Damian Ryan George, against Heidi L. Ohde, Horizons At Stongbridge Village Condominium Association, Inc., Mers, Stonebridge Village Master Association, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (ADDITIONAL), CHRISTOPHE MILLS | |
May 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM DIVISION CV-G TO FORECLOSURE DIVISION FC-G | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/19/10 AT 10:00AM | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED HEIDI OHDE; UNK. SPS. OF HEIDI OHDE | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 992619 | |
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE FOR HEIDI OHDE | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HEIDI L. OHDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.