Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Satish, Samantha Apoorva, against Bella Terraza Condominium Association, Inc., Denardus N. Bowman, Duval County, Duval County Clerk Of The Circuit Court, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with SCHEMER, JACK M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 15160 PAGE 290-292 | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTYS FEES | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (REASONABLE) | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE BELLA TERRAZA CONDOMINIUM 05042009 | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, 05052009 | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DUVAL COUNTY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, 05012009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.