Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) case represented by Zahm, Douglas Clark, against Waltraud Coley, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DOUGLAS C. ZAHM, PA TO 12425 28TH ST., N, STE 200, ST. PETERSBURG, FL 33716 | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. BK 15262 PG 2063 | |
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1011500 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT $100.00 BOOK 15248 PAGE 1725-1726 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TENANCY | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 05/18/2010 11AM | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 986759 | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.