Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Complaint - Not Otherwise Coded (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-B case against Herbert C. Winston, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTYGART, FREDERICK B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Complaint - Not Otherwise Coded (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER (CONSENT), TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT. | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 05/16/2012 8:30 AM | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS (DEF'S) | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION , BY DEFT, FOR ENLARGEMENT | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE /04/28/2009 , HERBERT WINSTON | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 651856 | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS- HERBERT C. WINSTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.