Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elihu Perry Thompson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Loftus, Kevin Joseph, against Sunday U. Ero, M.D., Jacksonville Orthopedic Institute, P.A., represented by Saalfield, John Robert, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with CARITHERS JR., HUGH A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARITHERS JR., HUGH A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2009 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION (PLTF) FOR NEW TRIAL | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 16474 PAGE 1105-1105 | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | VERDICT- NEGLIGENCE | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | DTB07152013J | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | JJ-THIS IS A PERSONAL INJURY CASE TRIED BY JURY 05/16/2013-07/26/2012-07/15/2013 | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK'S (COURT ID) EXHIBIT MEMORANDUM 1 PAGE | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS MEMORANDUM OF TRIAL 1 PAGE | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT (CORT ID) "M" JUROR QUESTION | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | QQ-JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.