Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vystar Credit Union.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reiss, Jennifer L, against Alex Lee Fields, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED UPON HSBC CARD SERVICES, INC. 9/22/11 | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE ALEX LEE FIELDS | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPOSITION ON SOUTHERN AUTO FINANCE COMPANY, SERVED 6-24-11 | |
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE ALEX LEE FIELDS | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) BOOK 14995 PAGE 553-554 | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION (CONSENT) FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 09022009, 11 AM., ROOM 206 | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.