Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wachovia Bank, N.A.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bloch, Bruce Eric, against Corey Daniel Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with JAY III, HARVEY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAY III, HARVEY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DISMISSING ACTION | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING HRG ON NTC OF RECORD INACTIVITY, HRG, AND PROPOSED DISMISSAL OF ACTION (06172013 AT 1010AM RM 705) | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OF RECORD INACTIVITY AND PROPOSED DISMISSAL OF ACTION | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 05/16/2012 8:30 AM | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED COREY DANIEL HAYES | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLTF'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE, 3/19/09 AT 10:45A | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 550093 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.