Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
U.S. Bank, Na.,, filed a(n) case represented by Zahm, Douglas Clark, against Dwight W Goodson, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Osprey Branch Condominium Association, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with WADDELL A. WALLACE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWADDELL A. WALLACE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR DWIGHT GOODSON BK# 3:11-BK-09043
Date: December 22, 2011CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1296313
Date: May 20, 2011FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 17, 2011NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE (ORIGINAL)
Date: June 14, 2010NOTICE OF SALE 06/10/2010 11:00 A.M.
Date: May 12, 2010FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BOOK 15241 PAGE 1422-1429
Date: May 07, 2010FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 07, 2010MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: June 01, 2009PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: April 24, 2009CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 662553
Date: April 14, 2009AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION
Date: April 13, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO FLA HOUSING FINANCE
Date: March 17, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO OSPREY BRANCH CONDO
Date: March 17, 2009NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14740 PAGE 409-410
Date: December 31, 2008CASE FEES PAID: $366.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 550114
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR DWIGHT GOODSON BK# 3:11-BK-09043 | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY ZAHM ON 5/26/11 | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1296313 | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION BOOK 15607 PAGE 367-368 | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE (ORIGINAL) | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DOUGLAS C. ZAHM, P.A. | |
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE AS PER ATTY. (EMAIL/FAX FROM: DSTRE SMITH W/ DOUGLAS C. ZAHM, P.A.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.