Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank, N.A.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Zahm, Douglas Clark, against Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Jeffrey Todd Stevens, Timothy'S Landing Owners Association, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO:SECRETARY OF THE DEPT. OF VETERANS AFFAIRS BOOK 14997 PAGE 1501-1502 | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: SECRETARY OF THE DEPT. OF VETERANS AFFAIRS BOOK 14997 PAGE 1716-1717 | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 776516 | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID $30100.00 BOOK 14980 PAGE 928-929 | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 08/19/2009 11.00AM LOT 218D, OF TIMOTHY'S LANDING UNIT ONE, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 57 PAGES 41, 41A, THROUGH 411, INCLUSIVE OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF FORECLOSURE, SALE DATE AUG 19H 2009, @ 11.00AM ONLINE BOOK 14958 PAGE 108-115 | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.