Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Lisa A. Roecker-Rush, Arthur E. Rush, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-A |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL MORTGAGE, AND THE ORIGINAL OF ASSIGNMENT(S) | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNABLE TO LOCATE ATTORNEY | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE - DOUGLAS C. ZAHM, P.A. | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO DISPOSE OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS BOOK 15492 PAGE 2199-2200 | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS BOOK 15492 PAGE 2116-2117 | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1185931 | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.