Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Martinez, Christina Riley, Paolini, Christopher Mark, against Carl Dean Hoskins, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-A |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: July 11, 2011CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1336736
Date: July 13, 2011NOTICE OF SALE 09/12/2011 11:00AM
Date: May 10, 2011NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (CO), CHRISTOPHER PAOLINI, ESQ.
Date: May 18, 2011FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BOOK 15594 PAGE 2433-2438
Date: May 09, 2011FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 09, 2011NOTICE OF APPEARENCE OF COUNSEL ATT. CLAYTON MILLER FOR DEFT-CARL DEAN HOSKINS
Date: March 16, 2011NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 29NOV10, 11AM
Date: November 16, 2010NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 12032009, 930 A.M., ROOM 224
Date: December 01, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFT.
Date: July 28, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO CARL DEAN HOSKINS 4/24/09
Date: April 28, 2009CASE FEES PAID: $40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 668933
Date: April 21, 2009NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14740 PAGE 353-353
Date: December 31, 2008CASE FEES PAID: $346.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 549990
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE BOOK 15661 PAGE 2181-2 | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1336736 | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES | |
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (CO), CHRISTOPHER PAOLINI, ESQ. | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 09/12/2011 11:00AM | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND NOTE | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BOOK 15594 PAGE 2433-2438 | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.