Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Natonal Association.,, filed a(n) case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, First Coast Properties Of Jacksonville, Arthur Wells, Locole M Dorrell, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 15493 PAGE 1336-1337 | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 03/11/2011 9:00 AM | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM DIVISION CV-G TO FORECLOSURE DIVISION FC-G | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED LACOLE M. DORRELL | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 2 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 1 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ARTHUR WELLS, 01092009 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ARTHUR WELLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.