Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank National Association.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Shapells, Inc, Arthur J Wells Jr, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BOWDEN, AARON K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOWDEN, AARON K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO U.S. BANK NATIONAL (BK.15049 PG. 1181) | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID $100.00 BOOK 15049 PAGE 1178-1179 | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 08/04/2009 11:00 AM LOT 15, BLOCK 4, ROYAL TERRACE ADDITION NO.2, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 18, PAGE 26, OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA A/K/A 2109 43RD W. ST, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32208 | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL VOLUNTARY, AS TO COUNT 2, RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14941 PAGE 1358-1362 | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG NOTE AND ORIG MORTGAGE | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 06302009, 930 AM., ROOM 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.