Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hardman, Adam Justin, against City Of Jacksonville, Duval County, Duval County Clerk Of The Circuit Court, Rachel Fountain, Sammy Wright, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNACHMAN, BERNARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 888489
Date: January 06, 2010NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE (PER ATTY, E-MAILED BY BETSY HUTTON)
Date: October 21, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 14, 2009NOTICE OF SALE 10/21/2009 11:00 AM
Date: September 22, 2009DEFAULT RACHEL FOUNTAIN;STATE OF FLORIDA;ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES,ETC
Date: July 24, 2009MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: July 22, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: May 04, 2009PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 20, 2009CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 629904
Date: March 11, 2009NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED RACHEL FOUNTAIN; ANY AND ALL UNK. PARTIES ETC.
Date: March 10, 2009AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION
Date: March 09, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, 01062009
Date: February 06, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE STATE OF FLORIDA, 01062009
Date: February 06, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DUVAL COUNTY, 01062009
Date: February 06, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DUVAL CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT, 01062009
Date: February 06, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE SAMMY WRIGHT, 01122009
Date: February 06, 2009NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14739 PAGE 2402-2402
Date: December 31, 2008CASE FEES PAID: $423.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 549951
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY FL DEFAULT | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 888489 | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO ORDER CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND REPLACE WIHT PHOTOSTATIC COPIES BOOK 15118 PAGE 845-845 | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ORDER CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND REPLACE WIHT PHOTOSTATCI COPIES | |
October 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE (PER ATTY, E-MAILED BY BETSY HUTTON) | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER (FINAL) DISMISSING CASE, CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUBSTITUTING PHOTOSTATIC COPIES BOOK 15053 PAGE 984-986 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS CASE, CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SET ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 10/21/2009 11:00 AM | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (SUMMARY) BOOK 15014 PAGE 43-49 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.