Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mathews Design Group,Inc.,, filed a(n) case represented by Sheppard, Sean Patrick, against Damon Brush, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with JAY III, HARVEY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAY III, HARVEY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DISMISSING ACTION | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING HRG ON NTC OF RECORD INACTIVITY, HRG, AND PROPOSED DISMISSAL OF ACTION (06172013 AT 1010AM RM 705) | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OF RECORD INACTIVITY AND PROPOSED DISMISS. OF ACTIION, 05202013, 11:02 AM., ROOM 705 | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 05/16/2012 8:30 AM | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SETH B. DEMPSEY | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 8202009, 930 AM., ROOM 202 | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 08202009, 930 AM., ROOM 202 | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DAMON BRUSH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.