Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stevens, Kim F, against Dtl Properties, Inc., Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, As Conservator And Or Receiver For Washington Mutual Bank, Hum N. Chau, Jane As Unknown Tenants In Possession Doe, John Doe, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAYLOR, L. HALDANE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNABLE TO LOCATE ATTORNEY | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE OF NOTICE OF INTENTION TO DISPOSE OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS TO: LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. STERN, P.A. | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO DISPOSE OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO CITIMORTGAGE, INC. BK 15175 PG 1697 | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 941401 | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 940832 | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMOUNT; $1100.00 BOOK 15163 PAGE 2402-2403 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.