Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) case against Florida, State Of, Jacqueline J. Miller, Robert Miller, Sweetwater Creek Homeowners Association, Inc., Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: JECQUELINE MILLER BK# 3:15-BK-010303-JAF
Date: March 16, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/CK #808266
Date: June 15, 2010CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1022266
Date: June 03, 2010CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1007665
Date: May 13, 2010THIRD PARTY BID SHEET
Date: May 12, 2010AMENDED/RE NOTICE OF SALE 05/12/2010 11:00AM
Date: April 05, 2010ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE (SET FOR 05-12-2010) BOOK 15200 PAGE 1954-1955
Date: March 30, 2010CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 971092
Date: March 29, 2010CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 966489
Date: March 23, 2010MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 22, 2010NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE PER ATTY EMAIL BETSY HUTTON
Date: March 10, 2010NOTICE OF SALE 03/10/2010 11AM
Date: February 05, 2010CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 917195
Date: February 04, 2010NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE PER ATTY EMAIL BETSY HUTTON
Date: November 16, 2009NOTICE OF SALE 11/18/2009 11AM
Date: October 26, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II
Date: July 21, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (VOL) OF DEFT TENANT #1, #2, #3, #4 W/O PREJ FED EX
Date: April 27, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 23, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE /ROBERT MILLER, 01/17/2009
Date: February 05, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE /JACQUELINE MILLER, 01/17/2009
Date: February 05, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE /SWEETWATER CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, 01/16/2009
Date: February 05, 2009NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14740 PAGE 185-185
Date: December 31, 2008CASE FEES PAID: $371.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 549809
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: JECQUELINE MILLER BK# 3:15-BK-010303-JAF | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 06/25/10 TO JHON GARRETT | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/CK #808266 | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC BK 15265 PG 1760 | |
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1022266 | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1007665 | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMTN $127100 BOOK 15242 PAGE 1138-1139 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.