Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) case represented by Lamb, Lindsey Diehl, against Donna Nelson Gurlides, Mandarin Pointe Condominium Association, Inc., Tenant #1, Tenant #2, Tenant #3, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE - FLORIDA DEFAULT LAW GROUP, P.L. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO DISPOSE OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO WELLS FARGO BANK BK 15810 PG 1713 | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1464706 | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1453656 | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT$.7100.00 BOOK 15794 PAGE 1827-1828 | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.