Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank National Association,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rieder, William Thomas Jr, against Carlos R Robinson, Florida, State Of, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., As Nominee For Hsbc Mortgage Services, Sophonia Robinson, Tenant #1, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAYLOR, L. HALDANE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED ON CARLOS ROBINSON 7/27/09 | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/ CK#557766 | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OR BK 14946 PG 2339 | |
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 724331 | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMOUNT; $30000 BOOK 14916 PAGE 1030-1031 | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 06/23/2009 1100 LOT 34, CINNAMON LAKES UNIT 1, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 43, PAGES 51-51A OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY FL | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14886 PAGE 1351-1356 | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.