Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against John M Sims, Barbara W. Sims, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY GLADSTONE | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS, DISMISS COMPLAINT AND RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS BOOK 15511 PAGE 45-45 | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS, DISMISS COMPLAINT AND RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS (NO REOPEN FEE PD) | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESCIND THE FORECLOSURE SALE AND MOTION TO VACATE THE CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND TO VACATE THE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 15498 PAGE 1599-1600 | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1197598 | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE THE CERTIFICATE OF SALE, MT. TO RESCIND F/C SALE, & MT. TO VACATE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS AND INTEREST | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL COSTS AND INTEREST | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO U.S. BANK N.A. BK 15452 PG 236 | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL COSTS AND INTEREST BOOK 15453 PAGE 570-570 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.