Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank Natonal Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Reder, Frank Albert, against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Avanti Condominium Association, Inc, Ronald D. Cox, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DAY, LANCE M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, LANCE M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-G |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY 10-03714 | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY BK 15141 PG 945 | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 897337 | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT:$100.00 BOOK 15128 PAGE 587-588 | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED/RE NOTICE OF SALE 01/14/2010 11:00 AM | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING FORECLOSURE SALE BOOK 15100 PAGE 271-272 | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 832574 | |
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RESET FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.