Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Villa Medici Condominium Association, Inc, Joseph Messina, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTYGART, FREDERICK B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF REFORECLSOURE BOOK 15156 PAGE 2211-2212 | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JOSEPH GAROFALO | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FRCLOSURE., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOSEPH GAROFALO | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 872323 | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED JOSEPH GAROFALO; ANY AND ALL UNK. PARTIES ETC | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.