Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Margie B Jewell, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bernard, Lawrence Jay, against Unknown Spouse Of Jacob Roland Cope, Elizabeth A. Cope, Dan Merritt, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNACHMAN, BERNARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT SUMMARY QUEITING TITLE | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 05042009 AT 9AM | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO EXPENSES OF SUIT | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT SUMMARY, QUIETING TITLE | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER STEPHEN O PARKER ATTY AD LITEM FOR DEFT | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED DAN MERRITT; ELIZABETH COPE; UNK. SPS. OF JACOB ROLAND COPE ( RESPONSE DATE APRIL 21, 2009) | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 631248 | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY GUARDIAN AD LITEM ETC | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.