Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American General Home Equity, Inc.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lewis, Sidney Erwin, against Julia C Parker, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FRYEFIELD, PETER J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRYEFIELD, PETER J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-A |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY, INC. OR BK 14911 PG 900 | |
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMOUNT; $5100 BOOK 14898 PAGE 395-396 | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 708847 | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 06/05/2009 11AM L3, WILKINSON'S SUBDIVISION OF L2 OF BARBERIE'S SUBDIVISION L7, TALLULAH, ACCORDING TO PLAT THEREOF, AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 6, PAGE 46 OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA. | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF FORECLOSURE BOOK 14866 PAGE 2389-2393 | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER BY LAWRENCE J. BERNARD AS COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY AD LITEM ON BEHALF OF JULIA C. PARKER | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES [REASONABLE] | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS ATTY/PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.