Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) case represented by Evans, Joanna Cynthia, against Robert Cuartero, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, LANCE M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, LANCE M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: ROBERT CUARTERO BK#3:09-BK-01831 (ORIGINAL) | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) BOOK 14793 PAGE 2360-2360 | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS; ATTORNEY FEE AFFIDAVIT | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT CUARTERO | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 549623 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.