Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Suntrust Bank,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barsky, Laurence S, against Frederick W Mcclure, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTYGART, FREDERICK B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING FACT INFO SHEET TO DEFENDANTS | |
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT BOOK 15160 PAGE 2491-2491 | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT AND COSTS | |
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING SUBST. OF COUNSEL | |
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBST OF COUNSEL | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FREDERICK MCCLURE | |
July 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF SUNTRUST BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.