Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kahn, Jeffrey Lee, against M Jolly, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FRYEFIELD, PETER J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRYEFIELD, PETER J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-A |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) BOOK 14823 PAGE 852-852 | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT M JOLLY AKA MARK JOLLY | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS, ATTORNEYS FEE AFFIDAVIT | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE M JOLLY AKA MARK JOLLY 1/10/09 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 549548 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.