Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.,, filed a(n) case represented by Fagen, Jessica Jo, against Tenant #4 The Names Being Fictious To Account For Parties In Possession, Tenant #3, Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Unknown Spouse Of Steven P. Seitz, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with BOWDEN, AARON K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOWDEN, AARON K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER $99,500.00 TO: ALBERTELLI LAW/BALANCE: NONE/CK # 17048, NOV 18, 2009 | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: JOHN TIPTON | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 790470 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 790470 HAD A REFUND OF $70.00 AMOUNT SENT TO ALBERTILLI LAW | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER A DEPOSIT OF $4,975.00 WAS AUTOMATICALLY TAKEN FROM REAL AUCTION BIDDER#7299. ALL FEES PAID INCLUDE: THE CLERK'S FEES OF $1,500.00, THE AUCTION'S REMAINING BALANCE OF $94,525.00 AMD THE $70.00 THIRD PARTY SALES FEE (AS PER SB 1718). | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE BID AMOUNT $99,500.00 - JOHN TIPTON BOOK 14998 PAGE 878-879 | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $96,095.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 789107 | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 09/08/2009 11AM L11, B6, OCEAN FOREST, UNIT ONE, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF, AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 25, PAGES 28, 28A AND 28B, OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA. AKA 1637 SUNSET DRIVE, JACKSONVILLE BEACH, FL 322 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.