Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Miculitzki, Yanina, against Edwin Rosario, Fior A. Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION BOOK 16046 PAGE 309-310 | |
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1615237 | |
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF (BID AMT $35,200.00) BOOK 15997 PAGE 560-561 | |
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CANCEL SALE | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | / JA (MISSY) CALLED / MOTION TO CANCEL SALE IS DENIED/SALE IT IS NOT CANCELLED | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE, FIOR RAMIREZ AND EDWIN RAMIREZ. | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 07/11/2012 11:00 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.