Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Home Finance, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Miculitzki, Yanina, against Augie T. Peoples, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with BOWDEN, AARON K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOWDEN, AARON K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION BOOK 14990 PAGE 1770-1770 | |
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION BOOK 14990 PAGE 1755-1755 | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 775315 | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID $100.00 BOOK 14977 PAGE 2027-2028 | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 08/18/2009 11AM L25, B3, SPRINGFIELD MANOR, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF, AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 17, PAGE 45, OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA. | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14953 PAGE 2404-2408 | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL MORTGAGE, ORIGINAL ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.