Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of New York Trust Co, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fintel, Hollan Marie, against Lawrence A Steward, Marian Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BOWDEN, AARON K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOWDEN, AARON K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 15111 PAGE 2343-2344 | |
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PRO SE ANSWER FROM MARIAN STEWART | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE MARIAN STEWART CERT MAIL 70081830000359758554 | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNK PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE LAWRENCE STEWARD, SERVED 08JAN09 | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE MARIAN STEWART, SERVED 08JAN09 | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNK PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED 4 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.