Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fcdb 8020 Reo, Llc.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by White, Cameron Herbert Patrick, against American Electrical Contraction, Inc, Julia Ott Canipelli, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Fc-A |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPEN ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED ADMIN ORDER 2011-02 | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY RE: JEAN D. STACIO, ESQ. | |
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE, FILED BY DEFENDANT JULIA OTT CANIPELLI | |
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS | |
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLAINTIFF'S | |
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 8/13/12 11 AM | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | OBJECTION (PLAINTIFF'S) TO NOTICE OF HEARING ON CANIPELLI'S REQUEST FOR ORDER AND JUDGMENT AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING , 8/13/12 @ 11AM RM 610 | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER AND JUDGMENT AWARDING ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.