Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Humphrey, Kimberly Anne, against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Sean Ryan Lawler, Stephanie C Lawler, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNACHMAN, BERNARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTY SHAPIRO | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, DISCHARGING LP, DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE BOOK 14865 PAGE 1636-1638 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS ETC ATTY/PLTF | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR APRIL 16TH 2009 | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING RENTC, 04162009 AT 930AM | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JDGMT | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AMND, | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | FILED IN EVIDENCE #1-PLTF'S EXHIBITS TO JUDGMENT | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED EX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.