Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) case against Miguel A. Jimenez, Bessie Jimenez, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORECLOSURE JUDGE, Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE - NO RESPONSE FROM ATTY | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO DISPOSE OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1081800 | |
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10/19/2010 @ 11AM ROOM 510 | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG. NOTE AND ORIG. MORTGAGE | |
May 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM DIVISION CV-D TO FORECLOSURE DIVISION FC-D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.