Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Marsh Creek Homeowners Association, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Wendy D. Plummer, Juan O. Plummer, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 15005 PAGE 1551-1552 | |
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 04292009, 9 AM., ROOM 206 | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DUE & DILIGENT SEARCH | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUAN PLUMMER;WENDY PLUMMER;MARSH CREEK HOMWOWNERS ASSOC INC;MERS INC | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT AND COSTS | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.