Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pritchard, Edward Brown, against Aida Willard, Christian Andrew Willard, Clarence A. Willard Jr, Russell Anthony Franco, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 823921
Date: October 16, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 07, 2009NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 15031 PAGE 2240-2240
Date: October 02, 2009NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE PER ATTY "ADAM HUDSON" EMAIL COPY
Date: September 16, 2009NOTICE OF SALE 09/16/2009 11:00 AM
Date: August 18, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 16, 2009MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 12, 2009DEFAULT CLARENCE A WILLARD JR
Date: January 23, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE CLARENCE A WILLARD,JR 12022008
Date: December 12, 2008SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE AIDA WILLARD 12012008
Date: December 12, 2008SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE RUSSELL ANTHONY FRANCO 12012008
Date: December 12, 2008SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE CHRISTIAN ANDREWW WILLIARD 12012008
Date: December 12, 2008NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14717 PAGE 634-634
Date: December 01, 2008CASE FEES PAID: $376.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 523256
Date: December 01, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NO ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ON FILE (AFFIDAVIT OF LOST INS 5/28/09) | |
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER CACNELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT AND ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ORIGINAL DOCUEMTNS FROM THE COURT FILE BOOK 15052 PAGE 42-43 | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 823921 | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, AND WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 15031 PAGE 2240-2240 | |
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE PER ATTY "ADAM HUDSON" EMAIL COPY | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 09/16/2009 11:00 AM | |
August 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BOOK 14977 PAGE 953-957 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.