Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City & Police Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lewis, Sidney Erwin, against Lois Yvonne Orbeck, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BOWDEN, AARON K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER (CONSENT) DISMISSING ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIM | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | CONSENT AND CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING THIS ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIM | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION IS ON DOCKET//DOCKETED 5/15/12//SENDING ORDER TO DENY TO JUDGE | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6-27-12 @ 11;40AM #742 JUDGE JOHNSON | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FJ/DEFT/ATTY | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LOIS YVONNE ORBECK 7/26/11 @ 3:30PM | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL WK OF 1/9/12--P/T 1/4/12 AT 2:40P, RM. 204 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.