Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wesnic, Inc.,, filed a(n) case represented by Lippes, Harold Seibert, against Hines Iii J, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2002 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE DOCKET | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL 10/12 & 10/13/09 AT 10:00A--P/T 9/25/09 AT 10:00A, RM. 206 | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE & OBJECTIONS, FROM HINES, III, INC./ATTY | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY WESNIC, INC | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 06-10-09, @ 9:30AM (EX PARTE), IN CHAMBERS | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER (S) AND OBJECTIONS TO 1ST INTERROGS/DEFT/ATTY | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.