Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Farfo Financial System, filed a(n) case represented by Gonzalez, Enrico G, against Carrie M. Hubbard, Wells Fargo Financial Bank, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with SKINNER, JOHN H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 825914
Date: October 20, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 19, 2009CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 693319
Date: May 18, 2009NOTICE OF SALE 03/12/2009 11AM L1 B5 PEARL COURT U2
Date: February 06, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 05, 2009DEFAULT WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK
Date: January 20, 2009MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 12, 2009PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 12, 2009AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION
Date: August 26, 2008CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2008NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14554 PAGE 440-440
Date: June 24, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS MAILED TO ATTORNEY GONZALEZ | |
November 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT, WITHDRAWING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE, DISMISSING ACTION AND CANCELLLATION OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 15062 PAGE 2010-2011 | |
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 825914 | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, WITHDRAW ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE, DISMISSING ACTION AND CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE AS PER ATTY. (EMAIL/FAX FROM: LINDA LABURTIS W/ GONZALEZ) | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 06/25/2009 11:00 AM LOT 1 BLOCK 5 PEARL COURT, UNIT NO. 2 ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 12, PAGES 86 AND 87 OF THE PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FL | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER (EX PARTE) TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE BOOK 14885 PAGE 1647-1648 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 693319 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION EXPARTE TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.