Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Comp., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Jane Doe, John Doe, Anthony Ammons, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 631177 | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (UNIT#2) SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/ CHECK#11778 | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (UNIT #1) SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/ CHECK#7623 | |
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DUVAL CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BOOK 14782 PAGE 439-440 | |
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION (EX PARTE) FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK ETC BK 14730 PG 6 | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | C/T S/R 12-17-08 | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 517159 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.