Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Orsi, Philip Anthony, against Veronica L Peacock, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM / OTHER | |
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 15928 PAGE 715-715 | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 05/16/2012 8:30 AM | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 6-23-2009 ON VERONICA PEACOCK | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED PLURIES VERONICA PEACOCK | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 684652 | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED NON-SERVED ON VERONICA L. PEACOCK | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 473075 | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS VERONICA L. PEACOCK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.