Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Israel Boston, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Austin, Ronald Ray, against Aviation Airport Services, Inc, represented by Carter, Jeffrey A, Cleary, Andrea Davis, Obringer, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2008 |
CategoryNegligence Case - Not Auto Connected (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED AND REDACTED | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE (AMENDED) OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE (AMENDED) OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.